Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Michelle Rose, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mestaz, Steven Ross, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2014 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition with Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.