Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prescott, James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Prescott, Sarena J, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Robert B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Robert B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Review Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.