Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lutz, Stephanie Mae, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Gray, Martin Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Robert B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2013 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Void Filing-Denied Fee Waiver | |
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Response | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.