Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Monroe, Nathan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Monroe, Elizabeth Ann, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.