Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Duran, Raymond Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gutierrez, Jeanette, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management157 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions297 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time297 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Report | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner's FCS Fees Paid | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Refer Fam Court Svcs | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.