Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hoglund, Leslie, Iii, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Smith, Sissy Jean, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2013 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Long Cause- 5 Hours or More
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Long Cause- 5 Hours or More
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Decl Regarding Address Verification | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.