Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Derek William, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Phe, Elaine Sokjeng, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsraels, Valli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management154 days |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions460 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time460 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Respondent) | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.