Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hu, Yong Mei, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Diaz, Sergio, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2013 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition with Minor Children | |
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.