Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Poses, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Poses, John, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Consolidated | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.