Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vasquez, Jessica Marie, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Horta, Jose Diaz, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobs, Nan Cohan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2012 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition with Minor Children | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.