Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carroll, Kailagh Leiann Rose, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Schram, Eric K, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2012 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Denied | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Response | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.