Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Quistian, Venessa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Ramos, Rogelio, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 16, 2012 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Time To Trial384 days |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Rees, Annette E |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.