Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcalister, Araceli Parra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcalister, Brad Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Hara, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 09, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJune 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.