Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
29 Sac Incu Lp, John Gonzales, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Willbanks &Amp; Wood, against Lawrence, Melissa, Lawrence, Travis, Rachael Gonzalez, represented by Stark, Terry D, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Time To Trial34 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer
Date: March 25, 2013Notice of Review re Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 20, 2013Request to Set Case For Trial
Date: March 28, 2013Court Trial
Date: April 23, 2013Civil Complaint
Date: March 20, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Court Trial Court Trial |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Trial | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case For Trial | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Review re Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.