Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ludy, Christopher J, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2013 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.