Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cummins, Jasper T, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Meyer, Herman C, Esq., against Bonsack, Debi, Keith, Ralph Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2013 |
CategoryDefamation: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Demurrer | |
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Opposition | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.