Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prill, Rogef Leroy, Prill, Judith, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wells Call Clark &Amp; Bennett, against Desilva, Shauna, Desilva, Ashley Marie, represented by Cabral, Ted M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Granted Party Only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.