Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore Law Group, against Scalero, Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2012 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Default/Prove up Hearing | |
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.