Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt &Amp; Henriques, against Smith, Carol S, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2012 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Hearing | |
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.