Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Slevkoff, Nick, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Fryer, Alan, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2013 |
CategorySister State Judgment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Order of Examination | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Order of Examination | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Disposed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.