Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Resolution Investment Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson &Amp; Kennard, against Nicolodi, Ann M, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2012 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name and/or Address | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.