Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pitti, Rose, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Pitti, Morris William, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Harassment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Protective Restraining Order | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.