Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eisenberg, Robert, Md, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zumwalt Law Firm, against Mchenry Medical Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.