Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nco Portfolio Management, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld Law Group, against Mcnillion, Nikia, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Ameral, Ann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmeral, Ann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.