Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rachel Venegas, represented by Conflict 1- Cohen, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts with Garen J. Horst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2018 |
CategoryFelony-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2018 | Granted | ||
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Granted Motion Hearing Dismiss Case Judge: Alan Pineschi |
|
June 15, 2018 | FTA: Bench Warrant Issued | ||
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
FTA: Bench Warrant Issued Early Status Conference Judge: Garen J. Horst |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Early Status Conference Department 13 | |
May 21, 2018 | Not Guilty Plea Entered - Time Waived | ||
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Not Guilty Plea Entered - Time Waived Arraignment Judge: John Cosgrove |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment Eugene S. Gini, Jr. Department 31 | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint - Felony: Other filed on 05/15/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.