Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sonny Bartolome, represented by Cohen, David G., in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts with Colleen M. Nichols presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2014 |
CategoryFelony-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2015 | Heard: Dismissed | ||
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Heard: Dismissed Trial Confirming Conference - Dismiss J&S 62-125399 Judge: Angus Saint-Evens |
|
July 08, 2015 | Heard: Continued | ||
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Heard: Continued Trial Confirming Conference - Dismiss J&S 62-125399 Judge: Angus Saint-Evens |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Vacated: Not Heard Court Trial: Time Not Waived - TA 62-125399 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
June 26, 2015 | Vacated: Not Heard | ||
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Trial Assignment Conference Alan Pineschi Department 33 Hidden | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Vacated: Not Heard Trial Assignment Conference - TA 62-125399 Judge: Alan Pineschi |
|
June 24, 2015 | Heard: Continued | ||
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Heard: Continued Trial Confirming Conference - CONFERENCE 62-125399 Judge: Angus Saint-Evens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.