Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Crystal Collins, represented by Placer County Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts with Garen J. Horst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2011 |
CategoryMisdemeanor-Roseville |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2015 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Heard: Orders Made (Written) VOP: Warrant Return - FTC PCJ 15/1 FTA ROW 41-0332603 Judge: Garen J. Horst |
|
April 14, 2015 | FTA: Bench Warrant Issued | ||
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
FTA: Bench Warrant Issued VOP: Warrant Return - FTC PCJ 15/1 Judge: Angus Saint-Evens |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Vacated: Not Heard VOP: Pretrial Conference - JT 62-130167 Judge: To Be Assigned |
|
October 17, 2014 | Vacated: Not Heard | ||
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | VOP: Pretrial Conference Alan Pineschi Department 33 Hidden | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Vacated: Not Heard VOP: Pretrial Conference - TAC 62-130167 Judge: Alan Pineschi |
|
September 15, 2014 | VOP: Admit | ||
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
VOP: Admit VOP: Pretrial Conference - TCC 62-130167 Judge: Michael W. Jones |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.