Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Placer County Public Defender filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Virginia Stueke, represented by Conflict Firm, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts with Frances A. Kearney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2010 |
CategoryMisdemeanor-Roseville |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Cycle Time251 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2011 | Vacated: Not Heard | ||
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Vacated: Not Heard Early Status Conference - ESC 62-99898 Judge: Frances Kearney |
|
December 15, 2010 | Heard: Continued | ||
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Heard: Continued Early Status Conference - ESC 62-99898 Judge: Frances Kearney |
|
December 09, 2010 | Not Guilty Plea Entered - Time Waived | ||
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Not Guilty Plea Entered - Time Waived Warrant: Return - FTA ESC 62-99898 Judge: Colleen Nichols |
|
November 19, 2010 | FTA: Bench Warrant Issued | ||
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
FTA: Bench Warrant Issued Early Status Conference - ESC 62-99898 Judge: Colleen Nichols |
|
November 17, 2010 | Heard: CNSA | ||
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Heard: CNSA Warrant: Return - FTA ESC $5,000.00 62-99898 $25,000.00 Judge: Larry D. Gaddis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.