Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Galaxy Portfolios Llc, Worldwide Asset Purchasing - L, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clark, Rory W, Esq., Winn Law Group, against Rosales, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Determining Claim of Exemption
Date: December 03, 2018Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: December 18, 2017Civil Complaint
Date: September 04, 2007Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: June 28, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: December 18, 2017Assignment of Judgment
Date: December 18, 2017Judgment
Date: January 11, 2008Declaration of Accrued Interest on Money Judgment
Date: December 31, 2007Statement
Date: December 31, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2027 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exparte Appointment Hearing
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Determining Claim of Exemption | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Opposition to Claim of Exemption |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.