Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lefevre, Peter, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rowe, Anthony Drew, Esq., against Branham, Justina, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2007 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | UD Court Judgment | |
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice Of Trial | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.