Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Burton, Lauren, Burton, Patrick, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Petvet Care Centers California Inc, Potorti Md, Matthew Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2022 |
CategoryNon-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Patrick Burton and Lauren Burton against Petvet Care Centers (California), Inc., d/b/a Park Animal Hospital, and Matthew Anthony Potorti, D.V.M., along with other unnamed defendants. The plaintiffs allege s...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (By Serving CT Corporation / Agent For Service / Daisy Montenegro / Process Specialist) filed by Burton, Patrick; Burton, Lauren on 01/25/2023. | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/01/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Burton, Patrick; Burton, Lauren on 12/30/2022. Filed By: Burton, Patrick(Plaintiff) | Burton, Lauren(Plaintiff) Refers To: Potorti MD, Matthew(Defendant) | Petvet Care Centers California Inc(Defendant) | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 40.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Burton, Patrick; Burton, Lauren on 12/30/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.