Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Salles Construction Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Knight, Shane, Knight, Stacy, Salles Construction Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Salles Construction, Inc. against Shane Knight, Stacy Knight, and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges breach of contract and seeks damages and foreclosure of a mechanic's lien. Salles Constructi...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Salles Construction Inc on 01/06/2023. | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Knight, Shane; Knight, Stacy on 12/06/2022. | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint filed by Knight, Shane; Knight, Stacy on 12/06/2022. Filed By: Knight, Shane(Cross - Complainant) | Knight, Stacy(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Salles Construction Inc(Cross - Defendant) | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Salles Construction Inc on 11/08/2022. | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Salles Construction Inc on 10/07/2022. Filed By: Salles Construction Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Knight, Stacy(Defendant) | Knight, Shane(Defendant) | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Salles Construction Inc on 10/07/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.