Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gi Industries, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Weiss, Jonathan, against Arakelian Enterprises Inc, represented by Turovsky, Ronald B, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable (Minute Order 03/06/2023 - As to Bradley M Presant - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 03/13/2023 | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous submitted by Arakelian Enterprises Inc; GI Industries rejected on 03/13/2023. | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Electronic Service; Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement) filed by GI Industries; Arakelian Enterprises Inc on 03/10/2023. | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement) filed by GI Industries; Arakelian Enterprises Inc on 03/10/2023. | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard 03/06/2023 04:50:00 PM. | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Sanctions (CLM) - Pursuant To CCP 2023.010 And 2023.030 For Misuse OF The Discovery Process By Disobeying A Court Order to Provide Discovery scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura. | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply (In Support Of Motion For Sanctions Pursuant CCP 2023.010 And 2023.030 For misuse Of The Discovery Process By Disobeying A Court Order To Provide Discovery) filed by Arakelian Enterprises Inc on 03/01/2023. | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Response (to Athens' Separate Statement in Support of Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP 2023.010 and 2023.030 for Misuse of the Discovery Process by Disobeying a Court Order to Provide Discovery) filed by GI Industries on 02/23/2023. | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition (to Athens' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP 2023.010 and 2023.030 for Misuse of the Discovery Process by Disobeying a Court Order to Provide Discovery) filed by GI Industries on 02/23/2023. | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Electronic Service - Declaration; Response; Opposition) filed by GI Industries on 02/23/2023. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.