Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pacheco, David Ramirez, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Villalba, Orlando J, Hakimi, Helga, against Sundance Berry Farms Llc, Sierra Farms Llc, Goodfarms Llc, Crisalida Berry Farms Llc, Buenaventura Ranch Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Toledo, Ana C., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin F. Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | |||
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment for Pacheco, David Ramirez against Buenaventura Ranch LLC in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 03/01/2022. See Order Approving the Paga Settlement Agreement and Judgment for details | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference re Settlement - scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 was vacated. | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Approving (the Parties PAGA Settlement Agreement and Judgment) filed by Pacheco, David Ramirez on 03/01/2022. | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Submission of the Settlement Agreement to the LWDA) filed by Pacheco, David Ramirez on 02/18/2022. | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other (RE PAGA Penalty Settlement; JOINT) filed by Pacheco, David Ramirez on 02/18/2022. | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Raul Perez in Support of Joint Stipulation RE PAGA Penalty Settlement) filed by Pacheco, David Ramirez on 02/18/2022. | |
February 08, 2022 | (further) re Complex Case Designation and Status of Mediation | ||
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference heard 02/08/2022 08:30:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.