Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Summers, Robert, filed a(n) Misc Complaints - Other case represented by Sampson, Benjamin A, against City Of Oxnard, Hart, Dave, Hill, John, Yanez, Brian, Yanez, Bryan, (total of 5) See All represented by Frater, Elisabeth, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryMisc Complaints - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | (10 day) | ||
March 14, 2023 | |||
February 14, 2023 | Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
August 15, 2022 | (10 day) | ||
July 19, 2022 | |||
July 18, 2022 | Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Continued Hearing on their Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed by City of Oxnard; Hart, Dave; Yanez, Brian on 07/06/2022. | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (for a Continuance of the Motion for Summary Adjudication Hearing Date.) filed by City of Oxnard; Hill, John; Hart, Dave; Yanez, Brian on 06/29/2022. | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura. | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation for a Continuance of the Settlement Conference, Trial Date and All Related Statutory Deadlines) filed by City of Oxnard; Hill, John; Hart, Dave; Yanez, Brian on 06/01/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.