Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
French, Beverly Ann, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Greene, Brad Michael, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(Non-UD) (CH-100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order, CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order, CH-116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing) filed by French, Beverly Ann on 09/13/2021. | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 10/15/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
August 13, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Posting (Granted (Re: CH-100 Request for CHRO; CH-110 Temporary Restrianing Order; CH-116 filed 8/13/2021)) filed by French, Beverly Ann on 08/13/2021. | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by French, Beverly Ann on 08/13/2021. | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service (CH-100 Request for CH Restraining Order; CH-109 Notice of Court Hearing, CH-110; ETC) filed by French, Beverly Ann on 08/09/2021. | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 08/13/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: William R. Redmond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.