Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Andersen, Einar, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Andersen, Judith Faye, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Michael Lief presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Lief Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Andersen, Einar on 07/15/2021. | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 08/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
July 13, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Andersen, Einar on 07/13/2021. | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 07/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 07/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
June 08, 2021 |
Judge: Michael Lief |
||
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (GRANTED) filed by Andersen, Einar on 06/08/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.