Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Torres, Stacy, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Clifton, Lanea, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (CH 120 Response to Civil Harassment) filed by Clifton, Lanea on 02/19/2021. | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Clifton, Lanea on 02/17/2021. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Torres, Stacy on 01/28/2021. | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 03/03/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Torres, Stacy on 01/26/2021. | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Torres, Stacy on 01/26/2021. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 34. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Torres, Stacy on 01/25/2021. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Torres, Stacy on 01/25/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.