Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Ventura, Robert Levin Md In His Capacity As Health Officer For Ventura County, filed a(n) Misc Complaints - Other case against County Of Ventura, Robert Levin Md In His Capacity As Health Officer For Ventura County, Franko, John, Oxnard Bootcamp Llc, The Muller Company, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryMisc Complaints - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 |
re: Cross-Complaint
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
||
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - re: Cross-Complaint scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 was vacated.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Oxnard Bootcamp LLC; Franko, John on 09/03/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference - scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Status Conference heard 07/26/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
July 26, 2021 |
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by COUNTY OF VENTURA; Robert Levin MD in his Capacity as Health Officer for Ventura County on 07/08/2021. | |
April 20, 2021 |
Preliminary Injunction
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
||
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other (CLM) - Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in 20 was vacated.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 03/19/2021.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.