Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mcgaffey, David, against Mares, Alicia, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (no later than 10-04-2022) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 11/05/2021. | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 05/06/2021. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Venue) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 12/18/2020. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 12/18/2020. Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mares, Alicia(Defendant) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA on 12/18/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.