Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jordan, Carina M, against Coughlin, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Discover Bank on 07/26/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest) filed by Discover Bank on 07/26/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Military Status (Service) filed by Discover Bank on 07/26/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment for Discover Bank against Coughlin, Jason in the amount of: 3840.90 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 294.50 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/26/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Discover Bank on 07/26/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Discover Bank on 07/26/2021. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Coughlin, Jason on Complaint. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Sharon Coughlin; wife) filed by Discover Bank on 02/09/2021. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.