Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cruz, Alia Sakai, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mcdonald, Brian Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with William R. Redmond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Redmond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) served on Defendant. Copy forwarded to Sheriff for entry in CLETS filed by Cruz, Alia Sakai on 02/26/2021. | |
February 19, 2021 |
Judge: William R. Redmond |
||
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested is granted, order expires 02/19/24 at 3 p.m. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Cruz, Alia Sakai on 02/19/2021. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential CLETS Information CLETS 001 received and scanned into CCPOR for transmittal to Law Enforcement. | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Granted. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | McDonald, Brian Nicholas Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by McDonald, Brian Nicholas on 02/16/2021. | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Application/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by McDonald, Brian Nicholas on 02/16/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.