Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carbon California Company Llc, Carbon California Operating Company Llc, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against County Of Ventura, County Of Ventura, A Political Subdivision Of The State Of California, Acting By And Through Its Board Of Supervisors, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark S. Borrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | [CEQA] | ||
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (to Dismiss Case as Moot) filed by County of Ventura, a political subdivision of the State of California, acting by and through its Board of Supervisors; County of Ventura on 08/18/2022. | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (re Mootness of Zoning Claims and Challenges) filed by County of Ventura; County of Ventura, a political subdivision of the State of California, acting by and through its Board of Supervisors on 07/08/2022. | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Petitioners Phase 1 Joint Opening Brief filed by Aera Energy LLC. | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Certification and Lodging of Supplemental Administrative Record Volume 1) filed by County of Ventura; County of Ventura, a political subdivision of the State of California, acting by and through its Board of Supervisors on 06/24/2022. | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Orders) filed by County of Ventura; County of Ventura, a political subdivision of the State of California, acting by and through its Board of Supervisors on 06/21/2022. | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (RE List of Writ and Non Writ Claims) filed by County of Ventura; County of Ventura, a political subdivision of the State of California, acting by and through its Board of Supervisors on 06/17/2022. | |
June 13, 2022 | Further Status (CEQA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.