Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fischer, G Jack, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryTrust Proceedings |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Petitioner served the DE-115 served by mail on 02/08/21 for the 03/04/21 hearing. The court continued for statutorily compliant notice. Petitioner filed a DE-120 notice of continuance on 03/08/21 for ...
Judge: Roger Lund |
|
April 08, 2021 | for Order Confirming Asset in Trust Estate | ||
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Confirming Asset in Trust Estate) filed by Fischer, G Jack; Williams, Sheryl P on 04/08/2021. | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition Other (PR) heard 04/08/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Waiver of Notice of Hearing signed by Caryn Baxter) filed by Fischer, G Jack; Williams, Sheryl P on 04/07/2021. | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Williams, Sheryl P added as a Interested Party effective 03/29/2021. | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Waiver of Notice of Hearing signed by James E. Nordbrock) filed by Fischer, G Jack; Williams, Sheryl P on 03/29/2021. | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (Continued Hearing) filed by Fischer, G Jack on 03/26/2021. | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Waiver of Notice of Hearing signed by Linus Forbes) filed by Fischer, G Jack on 03/26/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.