Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Oyama, Toshiko, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Josselyn, Bryon P, against Yeh, Hsin Hsing, represented by Eng, Leslie J., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Yeh, Hsin Hsing on 03/16/2021. | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Yeh, Hsin Hsing on 03/16/2021. | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Oyama, Toshiko on 02/02/2021. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 21.
Judge: Jeffrey G. Bennett |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Oyama, Toshiko on 12/17/2020. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Oyama, Toshiko on 12/17/2020. Filed By: Oyama, Toshiko(Plaintiff) Refers To: Yeh, Hsin(Defendant) | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oyama, Toshiko on 12/17/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.