Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wong, Sabrina, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Maciel-Carr, Cynthia Renee, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | |||
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders submitted by Maciel-Carr, Cynthia Renee rejected on 01/06/2021. | |
December 23, 2020 | |||
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 01/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (on Court's Motion) filed by Wong, Sabrina on 12/22/2020. | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura. | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (CH-100 Request for CHRO, CH-109 Notice of Court Hearing, CH-110 Temporary Restraining Order, Blank CH-120 Response to RCHRO, etc) filed by Wong, Sabrina on 12/17/2020. | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) submitted by Wong, Sabrina rejected on 12/11/2020. | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Wong, Sabrina on 12/01/2020. Filed By: Wong, Sabrina(Petitioner) Refers To: Maciel-Carr, Cynthia(Respondent) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.