Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Radino, Laura, Prosser, Patricia, Carpenter, Robert, Carpenter, Danny, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mcbride, Julia C, against Wolff, Betty Jean, Betty Jean Wolff As The Trustee Of The Carpenter Living Trust Dated October 9 2014, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Benjamin F. Coats presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Return certified mail receipt 9590 9266 9904 2173 4130 36 dated 03/08/21 and signed by "C19 1204 Michael" from LA Court | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case file contents transferred to receiving court Los Angeles pursuant to court order. Central District Court LA | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Order Overruling (In Part) & Sustaining (In Part) Def's Demurrer to Pltf's Complaint; & for Transfer of Matter to Los Angeles County Superior Court) filed by Carpenter, Robert; Carpenter, Danny; Radino, Laura; Prosser, Patricia on 03/02/2021. | |
February 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The morning calendar in courtroom 43 will begin at 9 a.m. Cases including ex parte matters will not be called prior to 9 a.m. unless all parties have checked in on all cases and the Court determines i...
Judge: Benjamin Coats |
|
February 16, 2021 |
to the complaint
Judge: Benjamin F. Coats |
||
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Demurrer (CLM) heard 02/16/2021 08:20:00 AM. | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Betty Jean Wolff as the Trustee of The Carpenter Living Trust dated October 9 2014; Wolff, Betty Jean on 02/05/2021. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Carpenter, Robert; Carpenter, Danny; Radino, Laura; Prosser, Patricia on 01/29/2021. | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Plaintiff's Memo of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Carpenter, Robert; Carpenter, Danny; Radino, Laura; Prosser, Patricia on 01/29/2021. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.