Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laflamme, Alaisha Louise, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
COVID-19 NOTICE: Until further notice, all attorneys and self-represented parties in law and motion hearings must appear telephonically via Court Call; there shall be no personal appearances without t...
Judge: Ronda McKaig |
|
January 08, 2021 | |||
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Affidavit of Publication) filed by LaFlamme, Alaisha Louise on 01/04/2021. | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 41.
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LaFlamme, Alaisha Louise on 11/06/2020. | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed by LaFlamme, Alaisha Louise on 11/06/2020. Filed By: LaFlamme, Alaisha Louise(Petitioner) | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by LaFlamme, Alaisha Louise on 11/06/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.