Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harada, Gordon Seichi, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Younger, Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Judith D. Rhodes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith D. Rhodes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2020 |
TRO DENIED 07/30/20
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
||
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - TRO DENIED 07/30/20 scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Harada, Gordon Seichi on 07/30/2020. | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (DENIED) filed by Harada, Gordon Seichi on 07/30/2020. | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 34.
Judge: Judith D. Rhodes |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Consent For Court Assignment filed by Harada, Gordon Seichi on 07/29/2020. | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Harada, Gordon Seichi on 07/29/2020. Filed By: Harada, Gordon Seichi(Petitioner) Refers To: Younger, Wayne(Respondent) | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Harada, Gordon Seichi on 07/29/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.