Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The Arbors At Hvp Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moore, Pamela Abbott, against Bergman, Marlene, Harman, Jonathan David, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 |
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
||
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by The Arbors at HVP Homeowners Association on 12/15/2020. | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Arbors at HVP Homeowners Association on 06/29/2020. | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by The Arbors at HVP Homeowners Association on 06/29/2020. Filed By: The Arbors at HVP Homeowners Association(Plaintiff) Refers To: Harman, Jonathan(Defendant) | Bergman, Marlene(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.